ROUNDHAY PAROCHIAL HALL

Charity number: 1165064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £53.72k £72.68k £40.40k £41.13k £22.33k
Total expenditure £18.32k £82.27k £40.48k £45.38k £24.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A