Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS, SOUTHFIELDS
Charity number: 1163989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev IAN TATTUM | Chair | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Lee | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Chambre | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jopp | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Iain Dunlop | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Krista Ovist | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andreas Hansen | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LESLEY HOTTEN | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE HAMILTON ROSS | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER JANE ALLEN | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOY GLORIA BOYCE | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.