Accounts and annual returns BETHESDA FAITH TABERNACLE
Charity number: 1165747
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 October 2023 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 October 2023 | 78 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 October 2023 | 443 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 October 2023 | 443 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 October 2023 | 808 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 16 October 2023 | 808 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 October 2023 | 1173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 October 2023 | 1173 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window