Financial history LLANRUMNEY HALL COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1165169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £15 £356.53k £410.12k £112.01k £130.32k
Total expenditure £5.81k £47.36k £58.61k £155.10k £212.55k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £351.68k £391.62k N/A £20.73k