Trustees THE NATIONAL DIGNITY COUNCIL
Charity number: 1165500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Thomas Lewney | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY FLATLEY | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roisin Elizabeth Burton | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Copleston | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR REKHA ELASWARAPU | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAN BURNS | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Squadron Leader ALAN RAYMOND DUDLEY CLARK MBE | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.