Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN ROSS-ON-WYE

Charity number: 1163776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MELANIE MARGARET MELLOR Trustee 14 September 2022
ROSS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Julian Timothy Gerard Hallett Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Gerald Altree Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Rev Tiffany Jackson Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Paul Bernard George Cummings Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Paul Mason Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Stanley Roy Milnes Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record
Sean Alexander Semple Trustee 30 July 2019
None on record
Peter Anthony Reynolds Trustee 03 April 2019
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH ROSS-ON-WYE
Received: On time
Rachel Charlotte Lewis Trustee 03 April 2019
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH ROSS-ON-WYE
Received: On time
CANON FREDA DAVIES Trustee 03 April 2019
ROSS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ROSS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Dr JOHN HENRY SETCHFIELD Trustee 03 April 2019
HANNAH PURCHAS FOR POOR FUND
Received: On time
ANNE ELIZABETH MORRIS Trustee 03 April 2019
None on record
Timothy Arnold Waters Trustee 03 April 2019
None on record
PAUL ANTHONY EWARD Trustee 03 April 2018
BISHOP MASCALL CENTRE FOUNDATION
Received: 10 days late
HOLTS HEALTH CENTRE FUND
Received: On time
Rev CHRISTOPHER JOHN BLANCHARD Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
BRYAN STANLEY JONES Trustee 05 April 2017
ROSS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HANNAH PURCHAS FOR POOR FUND
Received: On time
ROSS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev CAROLINE ELIZABETH ALICE PASCOE Trustee 31 December 2016
None on record
DR JANET MARY COOPER MA Trustee 29 April 2016
WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS FIELD CLUB
Received: On time
Mark Sanderson Trustee 27 April 2016
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH ROSS-ON-WYE
Received: On time