Financial history SANDBACH CONCERT SERIES

Charity number: 1166321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/08/2018 01/08/2019 01/08/2020 01/08/2021 01/08/2022
Total gross income £10.88k £16.87k £12.46k £8.82k £10.36k
Total expenditure £12.69k £11.30k £9.34k £7.88k £14.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.00k £2.50k N/A £2.50k