Financial history THE CONGREGATION OF MARIE AUXILIATRICE CIO

Charity number: 1165097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £359.30k £362.44k £378.88k £302.22k £305.10k
Total expenditure £337.90k £352.14k £410.08k £330.43k £304.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A