BIG VOICE LONDON

Charity number: 1169238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 15 September 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 01 October 2019 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 24 September 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required