Financial history ALLEZ CHARITY EVENTS

Charity number: 1164828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £1.43k £5.45k £4.61k £2.37k £1.85k
Total expenditure £2.32k £5.00k £4.59k £2.68k £2.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A