Trustees THE FULSHAW WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1164633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Simmons | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wendy Taylor | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Parr | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Drake | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANE RAWLINGS | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolynne Powell | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr CATHERINE HESSNER | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE KENNEDY | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE HAMILTON HOLLAND | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS JENNIE PALIN BA | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS DEE WAUGH | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA STEVENS | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.