Financial history JO'S APPEAL

Charity number: 1165020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/10/2016 03/10/2017 03/10/2018 03/10/2019 03/10/2020
Total gross income £49.39k £31.74k £11.72k £13.49k £4.30k
Total expenditure £28.25k £24.10k £17.60k £13.76k £12.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A