Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE DIVINE WITH ST JAMES THE APOSTLE KENNINGTON
Charity number: 1164999

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canon Mark Williams | Chair | 05 January 2010 |
|
|||||
Rev Annie Wanjohi | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Maragh | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Hawkes | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Chapman | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angel Faith Locken | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Bell | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas James Quanrud | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kumba Kanja Ngegba | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Douglas Gibbs | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stuart Labran | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sebastian David Tudor Harries | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Akua Kesse | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Irene Mosunmola Tewogbade | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL GEOFFREY HALL | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET EUGENIE GROCIA | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||
VENESSA DENNY | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE ANNETTE REID-HAMILTON | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK VINCENT DICKINSON | Trustee | 29 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr EMMANUEL OMOLOLU ADESIOYE | Trustee | 25 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY MARTIN | Trustee | 28 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA YVONNE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 25 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
SAMSON JOSHUA OGUNBANJO | Trustee | 20 April 1997 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS HODGSON | Trustee | 17 April 1978 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.