Trustees MICAH LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1168689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ELLEN LOUDON Chair 09 August 2016
TOGETHER LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL CHURCH OF ENGLAND COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL AID (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
TSEDAQAH HOUSE, LIVERPOOL
Recently registered
Philip Bishop Trustee 01 February 2020
None on record
Paul Smith Trustee 20 March 2018
None on record
Rev Miranda Threlfall-Holmes Trustee 17 November 2017
MODERN CHURCH
Received: On time
MISSION IN THE ECONOMY
Received: On time
THE LIVERPOOL DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE-IN-THE-CITY, LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
WILLIAM BATES DUMBEL'S LEGACY
Received: On time
THE QUEEN'S FOUNDATION FOR ECUMENICAL THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION
Received: On time
Rev Canon Dr Crispin Pailing Trustee 17 November 2017
LIVERPOOL BLITZ MEMORIAL APPEAL
Received: On time
MISSION IN THE ECONOMY
Received: On time
LOCAL SOLUTIONS
Received: On time
EARLY MUSIC AS EDUCATION
Received: 1 day late
The Battle of the Atlantic Memorial
Received: On time
Annette James Trustee 17 November 2017
FEEDING LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
Kathryn Yates Trustee 17 November 2017
None on record
Nicholas Peter Mendes Trustee 17 November 2017
None on record
JONATHAN RICHARDSON Trustee 17 November 2017
None on record
Elizabeth Collinge Trustee 17 November 2017
None on record
ANDREW HOLROYD Trustee 02 May 2017
LIVERPOOL COMMUNITY SPIRIT
Received: On time
REVD CANON ANTHONY O BRIEN Trustee 09 August 2016
None on record