ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF ROBERT DOWSE

Charity number: 507138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.74k £2.77k £2.87k £2.90k £1.50k
Total expenditure £2.74k £2.77k £2.87k £2.90k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A