Financial history THE CONNECTIONS BUS PROJECT

Charity number: 1168343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £100.71k £168.00k £144.99k £83.84k £95.11k
Total expenditure £30.26k £172.09k £139.29k £78.66k £110.14k
Income from government contracts £19.24k £145.05k £43.54k £23.61k £70.38k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A