Financial history COLLATON ST. MARY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1164816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £86.90k £110.48k £114.11k £118.43k £104.78k
Total expenditure £104.62k £92.22k £107.97k £107.79k £97.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £92.60k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A