OGC LONDON

Charity number: 1167063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 20 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 20 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 January 2018 On time Download