Trustees NATIONAL PARALYMPIC HERITAGE TRUST
Charity number: 1165416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL KEITH PURSE | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Nick Anthony David John WEBBORN | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Gaele Lalahy | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jessica Louise Macbeth | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Clive Harriss | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sophie Payne | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Anna Scott-Marshall | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Maguire | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Louise Emily Adams | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MARTIN JAMES MCELHATTON OBE | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH WOLSTENHOLME OBE | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.