AL AQSA MASJID & COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1165107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/03/2021
Total gross income £500 £11.87k £21 £200 £0
Total expenditure £989 £3.86k £19 £215 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A