FISHBURN YOUTH & COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1165240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £84.07k £115.12k £137.19k £146.44k £180.31k
Total expenditure £66.57k £122.76k £146.18k £149.77k £123.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.88k £5.01k £26.91k £17.33k £23.36k