Trustees THREE SCORE DANCE
Charity number: 1170206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Robin Linford | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Garrod | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Dwyer | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Frances Jane Lane | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edith Morris-Culshaw | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rachel Wood | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ROSENFELD | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.