Financial history THE ORCHARD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165765
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/11/2016 26/11/2017 26/11/2018 26/11/2019 26/11/2020
Total gross income £35.33k £8.94k £54.92k £45.53k £49.78k
Total expenditure £35.03k £450 £56.67k £41.80k £68.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A