MARKET BOSWORTH COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1165437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.22k £10.67k £19.61k £22.26k £17.09k
Total expenditure £7.35k £6.57k £14.24k £5.79k £4.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.85k £3.81k £4.88k £10.18k £14.99k