Accounts and annual returns Leeds Hospital Radio

Charity number: 507318
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 08 May 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 12 May 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required