Financial history FROME'S MISSING LINKS

Charity number: 1166492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.71k £12.23k £8.10k £4.67k £16.58k
Total expenditure £5.41k £3.64k £10.28k £2.84k £1.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.70k N/A N/A N/A £8.00k