Accounts and annual returns MOYO HEALTH
Charity number: 1166586
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 240 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 240 days | |
Annual return | 05 November 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 November 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 November 2019 | 29 December 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 November 2018 | 29 December 2019 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window