Trustees SPRINGERS AMATEUR OPERATIC & DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1166649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Screen | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Alfie James Back | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Diane Corina | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
BEN JASON MILLER | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
GARY KENNETH JARVIS | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA WEBBER | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
LISA ROBERTSON | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHARON SCOTT | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARRY MILES | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE THERESA JAMES | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE BATES | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.