Trustees AMPHIBIAN & REPTILE GROUPS OF THE UK
Charity number: 1165504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS MONK | Chair | 06 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Erik Paterson | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Hall | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Collinson | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frank Syratt | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samantha Kelly | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alice Pawlik | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Langham | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Hand | Trustee | 25 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR John Baker | Trustee | 25 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.