Financial history AREBYTE

Charity number: 1167185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £68.33k £233.33k £274.12k £474.61k £456.29k
Total expenditure £65.77k £209.37k £285.09k £403.92k £421.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £32.00k £15.00k £39.00k £109.54k