Financial history WATER ORTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 507441
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.63k £8.63k £11.06k £14.64k £15.03k
Total expenditure £5.01k £12.03k £8.54k £12.99k £9.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.20k £10.00k £8.00k