PENPARCAU COMMUNITY FORUM LTD

Charity number: 1168220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 17 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 18 July 2018 On time Download