Financial history FARNSTOCK

Charity number: 1165456
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.78k £23.06k £18.89k £20.40k £0
Total expenditure £15.06k £18.48k £18.76k £16.22k £5.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500 N/A N/A N/A