NO LOST POTENTIAL

Charity number: 1166920
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 01 January 2020 05 April 2021 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 05 April 2021 155 days late Download
Annual return 01 January 2019 12 December 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 14 January 2020 74 days late Download
Annual return 01 January 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 January 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 30 October 2017 On time Download