SOUTH WILLESBOROUGH & NEWTOWN WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1165542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £6.84k £5.87k £4.42k £4.62k £3.88k
Total expenditure £7.32k £4.92k £4.45k £4.22k £3.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A