Accounts and annual returns TRO'R TRAI

Charity number: 1167884
Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 323 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 323 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 November 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 March 2020 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 February 2019 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 08 February 2019 223 days late Download Open in new window