Governing document AGE CONCERN SWANSEA
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JUNE 1974 AS AMENDED 26 OCTOBER 1993, 1 OCTOBER 2002, 25 OCTOBER 2007 AND 15 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SWANSEA, AND WITHIN THE ADMINISTRATIVE BOUNDARIES OF APPROPRIATE AUTHORITIES AS REQUIRED.
Area of benefit
CITY AND COUNTY OF SWANSEA, AND WITHIN THE ADMINISTRATIVE BOUNDARIES OF APPROPRIATE AUTHORITIES AS REQUIRED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.