Trustees BOUNDARY PARK SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1167578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ANDREW COSTELLO | Chair | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Scott Clifford | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Couldrick | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Lewis | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Baker | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Marsden | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Poulton | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Atkin | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Moreton | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew William Rolfe | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS JOHN CLARKE | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN COULDRICK | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PRYOR | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.