Financial history FESTIVAL WASTE RECLAMATION AND DISTRIBUTION

Charity number: 1168696
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £0 £3.06k £1.66k £630 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £3.96k £385 £107
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A