Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN THE APOSTLE & EVANGELIST, WATFORD
Charity number: 1166071
Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Handley Handley | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wilfred John Sabor | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Beesley | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Mordue | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Vaughn Southern | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stuart Cockburn | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex William Evans | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
LIZ SHEASBY | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jannice Elizabeth Mordue | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Nickson-Chillingworth | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Dunnicliffe | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY BENNETT | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN ALISTAIR STEELE DAVIS | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anthony Hartree Wildmore | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.