Financial history GIRLS ROCK LONDON

Charity number: 1170457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/11/2017 28/11/2018 28/11/2019 28/11/2020 28/11/2021
Total gross income £21.38k £63.68k £51.20k £73.79k £79.08k
Total expenditure £16.11k £44.12k £64.84k £32.06k £101.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A