Trustees BURWOOD PRESCHOOL
Charity number: 1166835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Loader | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cathrine Walker | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Greig | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Pavier | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kgale Glynn | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Parker | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Bearman | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Booth | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS CLARE WARNE | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Hammatt | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.