BUSEN MARTIAL ARTS AND SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1169053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 30 March 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 30 March 2020 58 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 30 March 2020 423 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 30 March 2020 423 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1406 days