Trustees THE GREY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 507801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR REGGY SHEFFIELD BE DL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Philip Wiltshire | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Nicola Mitchell | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhona Earl McMeekin | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Steven Whiting | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY KIM PHILLIPS | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA ALLISON | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.