Trustees BABY BASICS UK

Charity number: 1168099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Lisbeth Hook Chair 01 August 2022
None on record
Dr Heledd Fflur Iago Trustee 01 April 2023
LLANW
Overdue by 18 days
Brian Wilson Trustee 01 August 2022
THE PCC OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST OWLERTON SHEFFIELD
Received: On time
BEN'S CENTRE FOR VULNERABLE PEOPLE (SHEFFIELD)
Received: On time
Penelope Anne Borkett Trustee 15 June 2020
TOTLEY RISE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Dr Kerry Montgomery Trustee 06 May 2020
None on record
Fiona Macrae Fairlie Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record