Financial history YOSHOR TRUST

Charity number: 1168607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £92.50k £34.90k £36.58k £41.13k £31.75k
Total expenditure £35.10k £69.31k £49.19k £36.70k £29.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A