Trustees FRIENDS OF HILDEN OAKS SCHOOL (FOHOS)
Charity number: 1167239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Taylor-Nicholl | Chair | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Margaret Hunter Robinson | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Emma Willan | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Broad | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Mary Robinson | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Louise Cronk | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Sandland | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gibb | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHARON WADE | Trustee | 14 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.