Financial history EDUCATION SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA

Charity number: 1166958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £549.98k £487.77k £858.26k £973.76k £794.60k
Total expenditure £133.10k £569.97k £543.48k £823.76k £871.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £549.98k N/A £858.26k £973.76k £751.33k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £42.92k
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £347
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £133.10k N/A £543.48k £823.76k £778.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £93.60k
Expenditure - Governance £23.75k N/A £51.75k £31.24k £17.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £76.59k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0