REFUGEE INFO BUS

Charity number: 1168538
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)