Trustees NARBOROUGH AND LITTLETHORPE COMMUNITY LIBRARY
Charity number: 1167677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr HELEN JENNIFER HUSTON | Chair | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE JORDAN-SPENCE | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY PATRICIA HULL | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Lesley Kowalewski | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Eley | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Patricia Peck | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLINTON INGRAMS | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WATKINS | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.